Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Carafa della Spina di Traetto

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1805BornNapoli
30 May 184135.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 184439.0AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
22 Jul 184439.0Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jul 184439.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
11 Aug 184439.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
12 May 187973.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
17 Jun 187973.9DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Carafa della Spina di Traetto (VIAF: 90263422)
Domenico Cardinal Carafa della Spina di Traetto (born , died ) Archbishop of Benevento

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
  • a cardinal for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jul 1844
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 49
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Nov 2016