Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amadio Zangari

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1806BornRimini
20 Dec 182822.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 184841.9AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
24 Apr 184841.9Ordained BishopBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
5 Sep 185145.3AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
31 May 186458.0DiedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Amadio Zangari:
Bishop Amadio Zangari (born , died ) Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 206, and Page 357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013