Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Civita Castellana

Dioecesis Civitatis Castellanae



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Romano Rossi, Bishop
  • Divo Zadi, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 16 February 1991
  • Metropolitan: Diocese of Roma {Rome}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,552 (599 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Lazio
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesicivitacastellana.it/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Piazza Matteotti 27, 01033 Civita Castellana [Viterbo], Italia
  • Telephone: 0761.51.51.52
  • Fax: 0761.59.92.13

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Civita Castellana
990ErectedDiocese of Civita Castellana (erected)
Diocese of Civita Castellana e Orte
5 October 1437UnitedDiocese of Civita Castellana
Diocese of Orte
Diocese of Civita Castellana e Orte
Diocese of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese
20 December 1805UnitedDiocese of Civita Castellana e Orte
Diocese of Gallese
Diocese of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese
Diocese of Civita Castellana (, Orte, Gallese, Nepi e Sutri)
11 February 1986UnitedDiocese of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese
Diocese of Nepi e Sutri
Diocese of Civita Castellana (, Orte, Gallese, Nepi e Sutri)
Diocese of Civita Castellana
16 February 1991Name ChangedDiocese of Civita Castellana (, Orte, Gallese, Nepi e Sutri) Diocese of Civita Castellana

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese
195066,00066,000100.0%6125867673013033ap1951
196678,00078,24099.7%4832809754515838ap1971
198075,30075,50099.7%5015651,1581910539ap1981
Diocese of Civita Castellana (, Orte, Gallese, Nepi e Sutri)
1990170,435171,25899.5%94481421,20038033577ap1991
Diocese of Civita Castellana
1999203,899204,19499.9%97731701,199710440176ap2000
2000203,700205,00099.4%97731701,198910240176ap2001
2001210,850212,57299.2%97731701,2401010239576ap2002
2002210,850212,57299.2%97731701,2401310239576ap2003
2003210,500211,97599.3%97731701,2381210139576ap2004
2004214,800220,80097.3%99661651,301128938076ap2005
2006213,800224,70095.1%114701841,161129338076ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 17 Apr 2013