Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Mignanti

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1824Born
18 Sep 184722.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 187248.2AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
5 Jan 187348.2Ordained BishopBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
27 Apr 188964.5DiedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Mignanti (VIAF: 233413205)
Bishop Domenico Mignanti (born , died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTolfa, Diocese of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia
Ordained BishopCivitavecchia, Diocese of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1873, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017