Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Mariani

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy

Titular Bishop of Samos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1830Born
18 Sep 185828.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Aug 188151.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy
4 Aug 188151.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Samos
14 Aug 188151.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samos
19 Aug 189161.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Mariani (VIAF: 257804905)
Bishop Benedetto Mariani (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRocca Santo Stefano, Territorial Abbey of Subiaco
Ordained BishopCathedral, Magliano Sabina, Diocese of Sabina (-Farfa)

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 496
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017