Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Chiaruzzi

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1831Born
11 Mar 185422.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 188250.9AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
9 Jul 188251.0Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
4 Jan 189159.5DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Chiaruzzi
Bishop Alessandro Chiaruzzi (born , died ) Bishop of Rimini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesena
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017