Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Mangeruva

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1823Born
20 Sep 184522.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 187249.3AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
9 May 187249.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
11 May 190582.3DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Mangeruva
Bishop Francesco Saverio Mangeruva (born , died ) Bishop of Gerace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSinopoli, Diocese of Mileto
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 305
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017