Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carmelo Scicluna

Deceased

Bishop of Malta

Titular Archbishop of Rhodus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1800Born
18 Dec 182424.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 187574.6AppointedBishop of Malta
15 Mar 187574.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
11 Apr 187574.6Ordained BishopBishop of Malta
12 Jul 188887.9DiedBishop of Malta

MicroData Summary for Carmelo Scicluna (VIAF: 132125115)
Archbishop Carmelo Scicluna (born , died ) Bishop of Malta

EventPlace
Birth PlacePinto, Diocese of Malta
Ordained BishopMalta, Diocese of Malta

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 378
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1875, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Mar 2017