Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonius Grech-Delicata-Testaferrata-Cassia

Deceased

Bishop of Gozo, Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1823Born
19 Oct 184522.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 186744.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Calydon
14 Jul 186744.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calydon
15 Nov 186744.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gozo, Malta
24 Sep 186845.5AppointedBishop of Gozo, Malta
24 Jan 186945.9InstalledBishop of Gozo, Malta
31 Dec 187653.8DiedBishop of Gozo, Malta

MicroData Summary for Antonius Grech-Delicata-Testaferrata-Cassia
Bishop Antonius Grech-Delicata-Testaferrata-Cassia (born , died ) Bishop of Gozo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Valletta, Diocese of Malta
Ordained BishopReligieuses du Sacre-Coeur a la Villa-Lante, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 174, and Page 283
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1867, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Mar 2017