Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lodovico Cardinal Altieri

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Index

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1805Born
24 Mar 183327.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 183630.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
11 Jul 183630.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
17 Jul 183631.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
14 Dec 184035.4Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
21 Apr 184539.7Elevated to Cardinal
21 Apr 184539.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
24 Nov 184540.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
19 Mar 185751.6AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
17 Dec 186055.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
5 Sep 186156.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
8 Mar 186357.6AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
11 Aug 186762.0DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Altieri (VIAF: 32313886)
Lodovico Cardinal Altieri (born , died ) Prefect of Index

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAlbano, Suburbicarian See of Albano, Italy

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
  • a cardinal for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 43, and Page 61
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 188
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1836, Number 24
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Dec 1840
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 46, and Page 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast