Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco Magnani

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1802Born
18 Dec 182422.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Bologna, Italy
28 May 182522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
28 Sep 185552.9AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
14 Oct 185552.9Ordained BishopBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
6 Aug 186158.8DiedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Magnani (VIAF: 89300908)
Bishop Giovanni Francesco Magnani (born , died ) Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Portico, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 478
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017