Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Cardoni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Recanati e Loreto

Titular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne

President of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1802BornRoma
18 Apr 182927.1Ordained PriestPriest
185047.8AppointedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia
27 Sep 185250.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
7 Nov 185250.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
21 Dec 186361.8AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
22 Feb 186765.0ResignedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
22 Feb 186765.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
7 Apr 1873³71.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Cardoni:
Archbishop Giuseppe Cardoni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Recanati e Loreto

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1982
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 187, and Page 256
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 478

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013