Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Aggarbati, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Senigallia, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1813Born
22 Feb 186754.0AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
10 Mar 186754.0Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
29 Apr 187966.2ResignedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
12 May 187966.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
24 May 188067.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Senigallia, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Aggarbati
Archbishop Giuseppe Aggarbati O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Senigallia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCivitanova, Diocese of Fermo
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 449, and Page 513
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1867, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Mar 2017