Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Grossi

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nicopolis in Epiro

Auxiliary Bishop of Tivoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1832Born
19 Sep 185725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Pesaro, Italy
3 Apr 187644.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Comacchio, Italy
3 Apr 187644.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
1 May 187644.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
19 Mar 187846.1ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Comacchio, Italy
28 Feb 187947.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tivoli, Italy
14 Dec 188957.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicopolis in Epiro
12 Jun 189765.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Nicopolis in Epiro

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Grossi
Archbishop Alessandro Grossi (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nicopolis in Epiro

EventPlace
Birth PlacePesaro, Diocese of Pesaro, Italy
Ordained BishopPesaro, Diocese of Pesaro, Italy

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 217, and Page 413
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 567
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017