Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente Fares

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1809Born
22 Sep 183222.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 185647.0AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
4 Jan 185747.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
1 Mar 189686.2DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Clemente Fares
Bishop Clemente Fares (born , died ) Bishop of Pesaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLapedona, Archdiocese of Fermo
Ordained BishopCollegio di Propaganda Fide, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 456
  • c34: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017