Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Alberto Barbolani di Montauto

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1804Born
5 Aug 182722.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Dec 182723.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jun 185651.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
6 Jul 185651.6Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
29 Oct 185752.9DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

MicroData Summary for Alberto Barbolani di Montauto
Patriarch Alberto Barbolani di Montauto (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArezzo, Diocese of Arezzo, Italy
Ordained BishopApostolic Palace of the Quirinale, Pauline, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 29.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 107
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jan 2017