Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe François Zéphirin Guillemin, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Prefect of Kouangtong, China

Titular Bishop of Cybistra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1814Born
8 Sep 183925.4Ordained PriestPriest
1848¹33.7ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
16 Nov 185339.6AppointedPrefect of Kouangtong, China
8 Aug 185642.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cybistra
25 Jan 185742.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cybistra
5 Apr 188672.0DiedPrefect of Kouangtong, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe François Zéphirin Guillemin (VIAF: 55371322)
Bishop Philippe François Zéphirin Guillemin M.E.P. (born , died ) Prefect of Kouangtong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVuillafans, France
Ordained BishopPope's Private, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 236
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017