Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Sébastien-Adolphe Devoucoux

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1804Born
19 Dec 182925.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Feb 185853.9SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
18 Mar 185854.0ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
16 May 185854.1Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
2 May 187066.1DiedBishop of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Sébastien-Adolphe Devoucoux (VIAF: 317292525)
Bishop Jean-Sébastien-Adolphe Devoucoux (born , died ) Bishop of Evreux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon
Ordained BishopCathedral, Autun, Diocese of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon)

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 255
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017