Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-François Robin

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1789BornBracquemont
18 Dec 181324.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 183646.6SelectedBishop of Bayeux, France
11 Jul 183646.7ConfirmedBishop of Bayeux, France
14 Aug 183646.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bayeux, France
29 Dec 185566.2DiedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France

MicroData Summary for Louis-François Robin:
Bishop Louis-François Robin (born , died ) Bishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux)

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013