Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Robert Paysant

Deceased

Bishop of Angers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1787Born
17 Dec 181427.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Oct 183952.3SelectedBishop of Angers, France
23 Dec 183952.5ConfirmedBishop of Angers, France
25 Feb 184052.7Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
6 Sep 184154.2DiedBishop of Angers, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Robert Paysant
Bishop Louis-Robert Paysant (born , died ) Bishop of Angers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrosville-sur-Douves
Ordained BishopSaint-Étienne, Abbey, Caen, Diocese of Bayeux

  • a priest for 26.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 74
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,840, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast