Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hyacinthe-Louis de Quélen

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1778BornParis
14 Mar 180728.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 181739.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
1 Oct 181739.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Samosata
28 Oct 181739.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samosata
7 Oct 181941.0SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Paris, France
17 Dec 181941.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Paris, France
17 Dec 181941.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
20 Oct 182143.0SucceededArchbishop of Paris, France
31 Dec 183961.2DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Hyacinthe-Louis de Quélen:
Archbishop Hyacinthe-Louis de Quélen (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 299, and Page 332
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 374

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013