Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Douhet d’Auzers

Deceased

Bishop of Nevers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1771Born
19 Dec 180736.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 182958.0SelectedBishop of Nevers, France
27 Jul 182958.2ConfirmedBishop of Nevers, France
6 Sep 182958.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
9 Feb 183462.7DiedBishop of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Douhet d’Auzers
Bishop Charles de Douhet d’Auzers (born , died ) Bishop of Nevers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAuzers

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 285
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018