Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques de la Brue de Saint-Bauzile

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tempe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1761BornSaint-Bauzile-de-la-Roche, France
12 Mar 178523.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Apr 178624.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 182160.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tempe
21 Dec 182160.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tempe
27 Mar 183270.7DiedTitular Bishop of Tempe

MicroData Summary for Jacques de la Brue de Saint-Bauzile:
Bishop Jacques de la Brue de Saint-Bauzile (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Tempe

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 362

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013