Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph Cardinal Bernet

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1770BornSaint-Flour
4 Nov 179525.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Apr 182756.6SelectedBishop of La Rochelle, France
25 Jun 182756.8ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle, France
12 Aug 182756.9Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle, France
7 Sep 183565.0SelectedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
1 Feb 183665.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
26 Mar 183665.6InstalledArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
19 Jan 184675.4Elevated to Cardinal
5 Jul 184675.8DiedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France

MicroData Summary for Joseph Bernet:
Cardinal Joseph Bernet (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
  • a cardinal for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 83, and Page 327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013