Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Armand Chaudru de Trélissac

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montauban, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1759³Born
8 Jun 183374.0SelectedBishop of Montauban, France
30 Sep 183374.3ConfirmedBishop of Montauban, France
24 Nov 183374.5Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
18 Dec 184384.5RetiredBishop of Montauban, France
20 Aug 184788.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Montauban, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Armand Chaudru de Trélissac (VIAF: 299591005)
Bishop Jean-Armand Chaudru de Trélissac (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montauban

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrélissac

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,833, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast