Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Joseph-Pierre Guigou

Deceased

Bishop of Angoulême


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1767BornAuriol
19 Mar 179123.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 182356.0SelectedBishop of Angoulême, France
3 May 182456.4ConfirmedBishop of Angoulême, France
29 Jun 182456.6Ordained BishopBishop of Angoulême, France
21 May 184274.5DiedBishop of Angoulême, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph-Pierre Guigou:
Bishop Jean-Joseph-Pierre Guigou (born , died ) Bishop of Angoulême

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 187

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013