Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Fréjus-Toulon

Dioecesis Foroiuliensis-Tolonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Dominique Marie Jean Rey, Comm. l'Emm., Bishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Fréjus
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Fréjus (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Fréjus (suppressed) Archdiocese of Aix
Diocese of Fréjus
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Avignon Diocese of Fréjus
Diocese of Fréjus-Toulon
28 April 1957Name ChangedDiocese of Fréjus Diocese of Fréjus-Toulon
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Fréjus-Toulon (from Aix)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Fréjus
1950350,000377,10092.8%210150360972150180ap1951
Diocese of Fréjus-Toulon
1969556,000.0%24385328087800126ap1971
1980563,000647,00087.0%2031553581,5721179660194ap1981
1990560,000763,50073.3%2081443521,5906164533196ap1991
1999700,000880,00079.5%1962003961,76713220400196ap2000
2000700,000898,00078.0%1871963831,82713254498196ap2001
2001700,000832,29184.1%1911473382,07118199413139ap2002
2002628,600898,00070.0%2171013181,97618125413139ap2003
2003628,600898,00070.0%174672412,60822111410139ap2004
2004627,000898,00069.8%1891203092,02924186424196ap2005
2006660,0001,100,00060.0%2041033072,14918159391197ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 15 May 2013