Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccolò Cardinal Fieschi

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

Administrator of Agde

Administrator of Toulon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1456BornGenoa
12 Sep 148428.7AppointedBishop of Toulon, France
14 Oct 148529.8AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
148630.0ResignedBishop-Elect of Fréjus, France
22 Oct 148832.8AppointedBishop of Agde, France
15 Feb 149539.1AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
31 May 150347.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 150347.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Septisolio
28 Nov 150448.9AppointedAdministrator of Agde, France
5 Oct 150650.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
150751.0AppointedAdministrator of Senez, France
150953.0ResignedAdministrator of Senez, France
12 Oct 151054.8AppointedAdministrator of Embrun, France
5 Nov 151155.8ResignedBishop of Fréjus, France
8 Jan 151458.0AppointedAdministrator of Toulon, France
30 Jul 151559.6ResignedAdministrator of Toulon, France
1516²60.0AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
151761.0AppointedAdministrator of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
1517²61.0AppointedAdministrator of Andria, Italy
4 Nov 151761.8ResignedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
13 Nov 151761.9ResignedAdministrator of Andria, Italy
5 Feb 151862.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
5 Jul 151862.5ResignedAdministrator of Embrun, France
3 Sep 151862.7AppointedAdministrator of Toulon, France
152064.0ResignedAdministrator of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
24 Jul 152165.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
18 Dec 152368.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
20 May 152468.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
15 Jun 152468.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Fieschi:
Cardinal Niccolò Fieschi (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a cardinal for 21.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 31 May 1503
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 190, and Page 109
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013