Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tommaso (Jacopo) Cardinal De Vio, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1469BornGaeta
149121.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
150939.9AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
1 Jul 151748.4Elevated to Cardinal
1 Jul 151748.4ResignedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Jul 151748.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
8 Feb 151849.0AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
1 May 151849.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
13 Apr 151950.1AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
19 Dec 151950.8ResignedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
14 Mar 153465.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
10 Aug 153465.5DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso (Jacopo) De Vio:
Tommaso (Jacopo) Cardinal De Vio O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Gaeta

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
  • a cardinal for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 200
  • ob/c2+: CB, 5 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 6 Aug 2014