Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriele Mascioli Foschi, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1455¹Born
1511¹56.0AppointedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
23 Apr 151156.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
30 Apr 151156.3AppointedAdministrator of Castro [del Lazio], Italy
12 Apr 151863.2ResignedAdministrator of Castro [del Lazio], Italy
10 Dec 153378.9DiedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Mascioli Foschi (VIAF: 88890738)
Archbishop Gabriele Mascioli Foschi O.E.S.A. (born 1455, died ) Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncona
Death PlaceSavona

  • a bishop for 22.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 189, and Page 157
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1511, Number 33*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Aug 2021

Quantcast