Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ascanio Cardinal Parisani

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jan 1528AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
24 May 1529AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
20 Jun 1529Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
19 Dec 1539Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jan 1540InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
15 Nov 1540AppointedAdministrator of Muro Lucano, Italy
27 Jun 1541ResignedAdministrator of Muro Lucano, Italy
3 Apr 1549DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Parisani:
Cardinal Ascanio Parisani (died ) Bishop of Rimini

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
  • a cardinal for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1539
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 118, and Page 251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013