Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Sperelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Leone, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jan 1524AppointedBishop of San Leone, Italy
10 Apr 1524Ordained BishopBishop of San Leone, Italy
19 Jan 1526ResignedBishop of San Leone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Sperelli
Bishop Francesco Sperelli , Bishop Emeritus of San Leone

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,524, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast