Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gianvincenzo Cardinal Carafa

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1477BornNaples
13 Sep 149720.7AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
1 Apr 150528.3AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
21 Nov 152750.9Elevated to Cardinal
27 Apr 152851.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
31 Aug 152851.7AppointedAdministrator of Anglona, Italy
24 Jan 153053.1ResignedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
16 Dec 153458.0AppointedAdministrator of Anagni, Italy
26 Jul 153558.6AppointedAdministrator of Acerra, Italy
6 Sep 153659.7ResignedAdministrator of Anglona, Italy
23 Jul 153760.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
28 Nov 153760.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
21 Apr 153962.3ResignedAdministrator of Acerra, Italy
4 Aug 153962.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
26 Jan 154164.1ResignedAdministrator of Anagni, Italy
28 Aug 154164.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Gianvincenzo Carafa:
Cardinal Gianvincenzo Carafa (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a cardinal for 13.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Nov 1527
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 93, and Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013