Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baldassarre Caetano de Grassi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cittą di Castello, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1515²AppointedBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy
13 Apr 1519AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pesaro, Italy
10 Jun 1528SucceededBishop of Pesaro, Italy
Jul 1528²ResignedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
29 Dec 1529Ordained BishopBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy
17 Feb 1535ResignedBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy
1539¹DiedBishop Emeritus of Cittą di Castello, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baldassarre Caetano de Grassi
Bishop Baldassarre Caetano de Grassi (died 1539) Bishop Emeritus of Cittą di Castello

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Martin in Camera, Monastery, Bologna, Diocese of Bologna

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 168, and Page 274
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,009
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,524, Number 2
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,529, Number 29
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast