Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Zanetti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1533AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
27 Aug 1533AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
12 Mar 1534Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
3 Oct 1557AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Zanetti
Bishop Antonio Zanetti , Auxiliary Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Petronio, Cathedral, Bologna, Diocese of Bologna

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 295
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,290
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,534, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast