Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Braccio Martelli

Deceased

Bishop of Lecce, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1501¹Born
20 Jun 153029.4AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
17 Apr 153332.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
12 Feb 155251.1AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
17 Aug 156059.6DiedBishop of Lecce, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Braccio Martelli
Bishop Braccio Martelli (born 1501, died ) Bishop of Lecce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 196, and Page 224
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Nov 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1533, Number 7
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,497

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast