Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Rodolfo Cardinal Pio

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Administrator of Agrigento (Girgenti)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1500BornCarpi
13 Nov 152828.7AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
28 Dec 153232.8Ordained BishopBishop of Faenza, Italy
22 Dec 153636.8Elevated to Cardinal
23 Jul 153737.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
28 Nov 153737.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
24 Sep 154343.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
10 Oct 154444.6AppointedAdministrator of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
17 Oct 154444.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
29 Nov 155353.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
11 Dec 155353.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
29 May 155555.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
18 May 156262.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
2 May 156464.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

MicroData Summary for Rodolfo Pio:
Cardinal Rodolfo Pio (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 31.3 years
  • a cardinal for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1536
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,819
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 13 Nov 2013