Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bonifacio Cardinal Ferrero

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1476BornBiella
28 Jul 149721.6AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
1505²29.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
5 Nov 150933.8AppointedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
17 Sep 151135.7AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
1 Jul 151741.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151741.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
17 May 151842.4ResignedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
12 Dec 153357.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
5 Sep 153458.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
26 Feb 153559.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
28 Nov 153761.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
2 Jan 154367.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonifacio Ferrero:
Cardinal Bonifacio Ferrero (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a bishop for 38.0 years
  • a cardinal for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 330
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 13 Nov 2013