Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filiberto Cardinal Ferrero

Deceased

Bishop of Ivrea, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Vitale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500¹Born
17 May 151818.3AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
28 Dec 153232.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
8 Apr 154949.2Elevated to Cardinal
10 May 154949.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
14 Aug 154949.6DiedBishop of Ivrea, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filiberto Ferrero
Filiberto Cardinal Ferrero (born 1500, died ) Bishop of Ivrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiella
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
  • a cardinal for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Apr 1549
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,818
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,532, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 214

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast