Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Stefano Cardinal Ferrero

Deceased

Bishop of Bologna, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Sergio e Bacco

Administrator of Ivrea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1474Born
24 Apr 149318.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vercelli, Italy
16 Jul 149925.1SucceededBishop of Vercelli, Italy
5 Jan 150025.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vercelli, Italy
28 Sep 150026.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
21 Jan 150227.7ResignedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
24 Jan 150227.7AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
28 Jun 150228.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
28 Jun 150228.1Elevated to Cardinal
31 Oct 150329.4AppointedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
22 Dec 150531.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Sergio e Bacco
5 Nov 150935.5AppointedAdministrator of Ivrea, Italy
5 Oct 151036.4DiedBishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Stefano Ferrero (VIAF: 302903181)
Giovanni Stefano Cardinal Ferrero (born , died ) Bishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiella
Ordained BishopVercelli, Diocese of Vercelli
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Clemente, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)S. Sebastiano, Church, Biella

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Sep 1500
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 330, and Page 214
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,500, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast