Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcantonio della Croce

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jan 1528AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
17 Apr 1533Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
1554¹ResignedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
1563²DiedBishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio della Croce:
Bishop Marcantonio della Croce , Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 313
  • b/c2+: CB, 13 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015