Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Vincenzo Diedo

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jan 1556AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
24 May 1556Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
9 Dec 1559DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Diedo
Patriarch Vincenzo Diedo (died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPatriarchal Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB, 8 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Feb 2017