Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Bragadino, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vicenza


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Mar 1550AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
26 Oct 1550Ordained BishopBishop of Vicenza, Italy
1560²DiedBishop of Vicenza, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Bragadino:
Bishop Angelo Bragadino O.P. (died 1560) Bishop of Vicenza

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 333
  • b/c2: CB, 2 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015