Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Antonio de’ Medici

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Aug 1528AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
17 Apr 1533Ordained BishopBishop of Forli, Italy
23 Oct 1551AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
1552¹DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Antonio de’ Medici:
Bishop Bernardo Antonio de’ Medici , Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 156, and Page 198
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 13 Nov 2013