Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Ferratini

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Nov 1531AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
17 Apr 1533Ordained BishopBishop of Sora, Italy
14 Jan 1534AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
Jun 1534DiedBishop of Chiusi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Ferratini
Bishop Bartolomeo Ferratini (died Jun 1534) Bishop of Chiusi

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 302, and Page 171
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Nov 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,533, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast