Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leone Orsini

Deceased

Bishop of Fréjus, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1513¹Born
15 Dec 152512.9AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
10 May 154532.3Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
11 May 156451.3DiedBishop of Fréjus, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leone Orsini
Bishop Leone Orsini (born 1513, died ) Bishop of Fréjus

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 197

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast