Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Bragadin

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 May 1524AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
14 Jan 1526Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
23 May 1528DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Bragadin
Bishop Giambattista Bragadin (died ) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 95
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1526, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast