Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro de Andreis

Deceased

Bishop of Otočac (Ottochaz), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Oct 1520AppointedBishop of Otočac (Ottochaz), Croatia
6 Dec 1520Ordained BishopBishop of Otočac (Ottochaz), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Pietro de Andreis
Bishop Pietro de Andreis , Bishop of Otočac (Ottochaz)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 299
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Aug 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1520, Number 9
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,450

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast