Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franjo Živković, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Senj, Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jan 1521AppointedBishop of Senj, Croatia
3 Feb 1521Ordained BishopBishop of Senj, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Franjo Živković
Bishop Franjo Živković O.F.M. , Bishop of Senj

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 299
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1521, Number 3
  • nm: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Apr 2019

Quantcast