Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Durante

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Sep 1529AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
30 Nov 1531Ordained BishopBishop of Orvieto, Italy
4 Dec 1545DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Durante
Bishop Vincenzo Durante (died ) Bishop of Orvieto

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 323
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Nov 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,531, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast